Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/23/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/14/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/27/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/07/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/19/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/16/2014