Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/15/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/26/2014