Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/07/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/29/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/15/2014