Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/09/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/19/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/10/2014