Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/18/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/15/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/20/2014