Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/24/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/09/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/10/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/22/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/29/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/05/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/12/2014