Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/24/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 12/01/2014