Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/26/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 10/22/2013