Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/23/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/23/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 04/24/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/09/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/14/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/03/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/26/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/27/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/30/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/16/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/18/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/10/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/10/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 10/11/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/11/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/11/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/22/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 10/24/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/24/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/24/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/24/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/29/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/29/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/29/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 11/14/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/19/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/19/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 01/07/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/07/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/09/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 01/13/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/13/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/05/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/05/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/26/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/08/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/15/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/19/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/19/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/30/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/05/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/05/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/23/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/24/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/03/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/11/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 12/01/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/02/2014