Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
08/01/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-143. (TXT | PDF)
08/01/2014 Signed by President.
07/23/2014 Presented to President.
07/16/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4567-4568)
07/08/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5834)
05/20/2014 Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
05/20/2014 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-457, Part I.
04/12/2013 Introduced in House