Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/16/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/25/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/19/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/16/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/05/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/11/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 12/16/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/27/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/25/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/09/2014