Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/20/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/21/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/16/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/04/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/11/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/26/2014