Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/21/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/21/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/18/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/22/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 12/05/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/18/2014