Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/21/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/26/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/20/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/26/2014