Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/18/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/27/2013