Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/15/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/18/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/26/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/21/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/05/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/26/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/20/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/20/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/26/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/18/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/18/2014