Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/15/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/18/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/18/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/18/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/18/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/18/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/18/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/18/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/26/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/26/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/26/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/06/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/06/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/21/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/21/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 06/05/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/18/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/10/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/18/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/18/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/18/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/27/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/27/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/08/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/22/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/22/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 12/05/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/03/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/03/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/20/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/26/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/09/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 07/09/2014