Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/15/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/15/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/15/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/15/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 02/28/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/14/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/14/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/30/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/30/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/30/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/30/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/30/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/30/2014