Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/15/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/15/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/16/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/16/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/14/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/15/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 09/18/2014