Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/26/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/30/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2013