Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/30/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/30/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014