Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/30/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/07/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/11/2013