Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/26/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/30/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/07/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/07/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/16/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/16/2013