Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/07/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/07/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/15/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/21/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/23/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/30/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/26/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/21/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/05/2014