Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/25/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/30/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/09/2013