There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To affirm the policy of the United States regarding Internet governance.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/14/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 145).(text: CR H2582)
05/03/2013Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-50.
04/16/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/15/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
05/14/2013-7:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/14/2013-7:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 145). (text: CR H2582)
05/14/2013-6:54pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2587)
05/14/2013-5:29pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/14/2013-5:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1580.
05/14/2013-5:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2582-2584)
05/14/2013-5:17pmHouseMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/03/2013HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 21.
05/03/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-50.
04/17/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/17/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/16/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/16/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/16/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (32)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce04/16/2013 Referred to
04/17/2013 Markup by
05/03/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-50
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology04/16/2013 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/15/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1580.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1580. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/14/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that it is the policy of the United States to preserve and advance the successful multistakeholder model (under which the private sector, civil society, academia, and individual users operate in an environment where information flows free from government control over content or the freedom of expression) that governs the Internet.