Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/22/2013