Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/16/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 04/16/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/16/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/16/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/17/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/16/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/17/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/16/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/17/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/27/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/09/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/07/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/28/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew