Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/26/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/17/2014