There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veteran's I.D. Card Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to issue, upon request, veteran identification cards to certain veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/17/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/26/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/17/2013Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/23/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/27/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/17/2013 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations04/26/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1598.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1598. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/17/2013)

Veteran's I.D. Card Act - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to issue a veteran's identification card to any veteran who requests such card and is neither entitled to military retired pay nor enrolled in the VA system of patient enrollment. Requires such card, among other things, to: (1) display their name and photograph, and (2) serve as proof that the veteran honorably served in the Armed Forces and has a DD-214 form or other official document in their personnel file that describes their military service. Directs the Secretary to charge a card fee. States that such card shall not serve as proof of entitlement to any benefits.