Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/23/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/27/2014