Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/14/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/23/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/25/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/06/2014