Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/24/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/24/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/06/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 06/06/2013