There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Military Spouse Job Continuity Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow a credit against income tax for amounts paid by a spouse of a member of the Armed Forces for a new State license or certification required by reason of a permanent change in the duty station of such member to another State.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/18/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/18/2013Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (157)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/17/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/31/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/02/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/04/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/23/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/24/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/24/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/09/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/11/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/11/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/11/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/11/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/14/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/14/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/17/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/17/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/22/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/24/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/24/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/29/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/30/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/30/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/30/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/30/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/30/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/30/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/31/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/31/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 08/01/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/18/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/18/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1620. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/18/2013)

Military Spouse Job Continuity Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow the spouse of a member of the Armed Forces (military spouse) who moves with such member to another state under a permanent change of station order a tax credit for up to $500 of qualified relicensing costs incurred by such spouse. Defines "qualified relicensing costs" as costs for a state license or certification to engage in the profession that such military spouse engaged in while residing in the former state.