Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/17/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/31/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/02/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/04/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/23/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/24/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/24/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/09/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/11/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/11/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/11/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/11/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/14/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/14/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/17/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/17/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/22/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/24/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/24/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/29/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/30/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/30/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/30/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/30/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/30/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/30/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/31/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/31/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 08/01/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/18/2014