Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/08/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/09/2013