Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/17/2014