Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/09/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/09/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/02/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/14/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/27/2014