Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/15/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/13/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/28/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 03/05/2013