Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/25/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/25/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/23/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/05/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/05/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/16/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/11/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/22/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/08/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/18/2014