Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/25/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/31/2014