Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/25/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/30/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/14/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/26/2014