Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/15/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/19/2014