Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/25/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 04/17/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/16/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/06/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/27/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/22/2014