Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/01/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/30/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/20/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/18/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/09/2014