Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/18/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/08/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/14/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/26/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/29/2014