Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/26/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/09/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/18/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/21/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/08/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 01/14/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/01/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/29/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/31/2014