Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/03/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/17/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/10/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/14/2014