Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/09/2013