Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/17/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 11/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/10/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/08/2014